Reply To: Challenge Questions – 2

Home Forums VMTTC Online Discussion Forum Challenge Questions – 2 Reply To: Challenge Questions – 2

#31128
Satya
Participant

47 x 67 –> to calculate the last figures no change in the formula (when the tens place is the same digit and one place digits add to 10). so last 2 digits of the answer is 49.

First two digits can be calculated by multiplying the first 2 digits of both numbers and adding it with the units place number. So (4×6) + 7 = 31

47×67 = 3149

Similarly 85×25  = (16+5) 25 = 2125

54×54 = (25+4) 16 = 2916

94×67 can be written as 2x 47×67 –> 2x 3149 [from the above] –> 6298

32×36 can be written as (32×72) / 2 –> 2304 / 2 = 1152

error:
Scroll to Top
Visit Us On FacebookVisit Us On Youtube