Reply To: Challenge Questions – 2

Home Forums VMTTC Online Discussion Forum Challenge Questions – 2 Reply To: Challenge Questions – 2

#31127
Preeti Pathak
Participant

47 * 67

For the first part of the answer,

=Product of the digits in tens place  that add up to 10 +  digit in ones place

=(4*6) + 7=24+7= 31_____(1)

For the second part,

simply multiply the digits in one’s place, so 7 * 7=49________(2)

combining (1) & (2) gives

47 * 67 = 3139

To find 94 * 67

we can use the sutra “proportionately” here.

94= 2 * 47.

47 * 67= 3139 and double it ,so 94 * 67= 2 *3139=6278

To find 32 * 36

36 * 2=72

using the “proportionately” sutra, 7 and 3 add up to 10,

32 * 72 = 2304 and halve it ,so 32 *36=1152

Thanks

error:
Scroll to Top
Visit Us On FacebookVisit Us On Youtube