Reply To: Exploring Multiplication

Home Forums VMTTC Online Discussion Forum Exploring Multiplication Reply To: Exploring Multiplication

#31733
Anupama Cherukuri
Participant

For 11 X 56

Base method –  11    + 1

14   +4    (56/4)

——————

15        4            =    154 * 4 = 616

Average  =    (11*4) 44  X 56 = 6 Avg = 2500 (50*50) – 6* 6 = 2464/4 = 616

By one more = (11*2) 22  X (56/2)  28   = 616

Double and Halving =  (56/2 )  28 * 11 = 308 * 2  = 616

Eleven  =  56 * 11 = 5   11    6    = 616

Addition & Subtraction = 56 * 10 = 560 + 56  =  616

 

error:
Scroll to Top
Visit Us On FacebookVisit Us On Youtube