Reply To: Challenge Questions – 2

Home Forums VMTTC Online Discussion Forum Challenge Questions – 2 Reply To: Challenge Questions – 2

#31122

Challenge Question 11:

47 x 67 = 3149

We can solve this problem by using first by first and last by last sutra.

We multiply digits in tens place that add up to 10 (4×6 ) and add units place number (7) to the final answer   24+7 = 31

we simply multiply digits in units place to get the second part of the answer. 7×7 = 49

47 x 67 = 3149

 

94 x 67 can be solved using proportionately sutra.

94 = 47×2

 

67 x 47 = 3149 and we double the answer to solve 94 x 67 = 6298

<b>32 x 36 can be solved using proportionately sutra again.</b>

We double 36 to get 72.

32×72 = 2304 and we halve the result to get final answer 1152.

Regards.

 

error:
Scroll to Top
Visit Us On FacebookVisit Us On Youtube